Senate | 05/23/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2506 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2375 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 585 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 318 | |
Senate | 02/03/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/03/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |