E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/25/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3526
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4802
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1264
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4770
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4780
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4780
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4617
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1645
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 368
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 368
|
Senate
|
02/09/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 305
|
Senate
|
02/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|