House | 05/10/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2383 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2383 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2004 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1280 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1174 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1174 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1174 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1134 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 369 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 369 | |
Senate | 02/07/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |