E
|
05/12/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
05/12/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
E
|
05/03/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2793
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1651
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2657
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2031
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#464
|
Journal Page: 2030
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2030
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2030
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1976
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1975
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 1975
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1975
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/19/11 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 346
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2005
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 904
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 477
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 369
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 369
|
Senate
|
02/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|