E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/25/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3526
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2999
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2999
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2999
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2993
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2569
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4131
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1143
|
Journal Page: 4130
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4130
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4130
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4082
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4082
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 818
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 818
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 818
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 817
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 817
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 817
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 817
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 369
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 369
|
Senate
|
02/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|