House | 05/18/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 3295 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3295 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3177 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2147 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1937 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1937 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Deuell | Journal Page: 1935 |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1935 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1935 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 370 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 370 | |
Senate | 02/08/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |