Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB550 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eltife S.B. No. 550
 (In the Senate - Filed February 8, 2011; February 28, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Select Committee on Open
 Government; March 31, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; March 31, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the required public notice of the names of a certain
 number of finalists for the position of superintendent of a public
 school district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 552.126, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 552.126.  EXCEPTION: NAME OF APPLICANT FOR
 SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC SCHOOL DISTRICT. (a)  Except as provided
 by Subsection (b), the [The] name of an applicant for the position
 of superintendent of a public school district is excepted from the
 requirements of Section 552.021.
 (b)  At[, except that the board of trustees must give public
 notice of the name or names of the finalists being considered for
 the position at] least 21 days before the date of the meeting at
 which a final action or vote is to be taken on the employment of an
 applicant for the position of superintendent of a public school
 district, the board of trustees must give public notice of:
 (1)  the names of at least three finalists being
 considered for the position, if the board of trustees interviewed
 three people or more during the final round of interviews for the
 position; or
 (2)  the name or names of all the finalists being
 considered for the position, if the board of trustees interviewed
 not more than two people during the final round of interviews for
 the position.
 (c)  Before the public notice required by Subsection (b) is
 posted, the board of trustees must give an applicant whose name will
 be included in the public notice an opportunity to withdraw from
 consideration for the position [the person].
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 with respect to notice of a meeting held on or after October 1,
 2011.  A notice of a meeting held before that date is governed by the
 law in effect on the date the notice is given, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *