E | 05/27/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 05/27/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4526 | |
E | 05/16/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2376 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4060 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2327 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2309 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2240 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3545 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Record vote | RV#952 | Journal Page: 3544 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3399 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3399 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 234 | Journal Page: 3399 |
House | 05/07/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3300 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1573 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1026 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 969 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 969 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 969 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 969 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 969 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 969 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 969 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 830 | |
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 370 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 370 | |
Senate | 02/08/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |