E | 05/28/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/28/2011 | Filed without the Governor's signature | Journal Page: 5040 | |
E | 05/18/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4118 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2472 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2510 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3863 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1044 | Journal Page: 3864 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3864 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3864 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3833 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3833 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB1177 | Journal Page: 3833 |
House | 05/09/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1482 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1482 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1225 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 902 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 835 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 586 | |
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 371 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 371 | |
Senate | 02/08/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |