House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2324 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 1482 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1482 | |
House | 03/21/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 922 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 613 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 613 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 613 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 613 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Williams | Journal Page: 613 |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 612 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 612 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 371 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 371 | |
Senate | 02/09/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |