Senate | 04/28/2011 | No action taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Subcommittee meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Referred to s/c by chair | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 373 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 373 | |
Senate | 02/10/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |