E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6278
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4112
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4112
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4112
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4111
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3334
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1291
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4738
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Zerwas
|
Journal Page: 4737
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4737
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4185
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4125
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 536
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 374
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 374
|
Senate
|
02/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|