House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4618
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 938
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 938
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 938
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 374
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 374
|
Senate
|
02/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|