House | 05/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4617 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 2384 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2384 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2004 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1280 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 375 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 375 | |
Senate | 02/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |