Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB616 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Rodriguez S.B. No. 616
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2011;
 February 17, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture and Rural Affairs; April 13, 2011, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 3, Nays 0; April 13, 2011, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sale or transportation of certain desert plants;
 providing a penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle F, Title 5, Agriculture Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 122 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 122. SALE OF DESERT PLANTS
 Sec. 122.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "desert plant"
 means the following genera of plants:
 (1)  Agave;
 (2)  Ariocarpus;
 (3)  Echinocactus;
 (4)  Echinocereus;
 (5)  Ferocactus;
 (6)  Fouquieria;
 (7)  Mammillaria; and
 (8)  Yucca.
 Sec. 122.002.  ADMINISTRATION. The department shall
 administer this chapter and adopt rules necessary for its
 enforcement.
 Sec. 122.003.  REQUIREMENTS FOR SALE OR TRANSPORTATION. A
 person may not sell or offer for sale to a first purchaser a desert
 plant, or transport for transfer out of this state a desert plant,
 unless the person has documentation as required by department rule
 that the desert plant was harvested for sale in compliance with an
 agreement entered into in accordance with rules adopted under
 Section 122.004.
 Sec. 122.004.  REGISTRATION AND COMPLIANCE AGREEMENT.
 (a)  A person who grows or harvests desert plants for sale must
 register with the department and enter into a compliance agreement
 with the department to ensure that a manifest or other form of
 documentation accompanies the person's desert plants when any of
 the person's desert plants are:
 (1)  sold or offered for sale to a first purchaser; or
 (2)  transported for transfer out of this state.
 (b)  The department by rule shall establish minimum
 standards for compliance agreements and the manifests or other
 forms of documentation to be provided in accordance with compliance
 agreements.  A manifest or other form of documentation must:
 (1)  show the source of the desert plants; and
 (2)  verify compliance with the compliance agreement
 conditions.
 (c)  The department shall adopt rules, including procedures
 for inspection or other mechanisms, to ensure that a manifest or
 other form of documentation provided under a compliance agreement
 does not misrepresent the source of a desert plant.
 (d)  A person must include with an application for
 registration under this section:
 (1)  a written statement that the desert plants
 provided by the person for sale will be harvested from that person's
 property; or
 (2)  written documentation that the owner of the
 property from which the desert plants are to be harvested grants the
 person the authority to harvest the desert plants from that
 property.
 (e)  The department may charge a registration and compliance
 agreement fee to offset the costs of administering this chapter.
 Sec. 122.005.  DOCUMENTATION FOR SALE OR TRANSPORTATION OF
 DESERT PLANTS. (a)  In accordance with department rules and the
 agreement entered into under Section 122.004, a person shall
 provide to a first purchaser or to a person who sells or offers for
 sale to a first purchaser the person's desert plants or transports
 for transfer out of this state the person's desert plants a manifest
 or other form of documentation of the source of the desert plants.
 (b)  A manifest or other form of documentation of the source
 of a desert plant must accompany the desert plant when:
 (1)  sold or offered for sale; or
 (2)  transported for transfer out of this state.
 Sec. 122.006.  STOP-SALE ORDER. In enforcing this chapter,
 the department may issue and enforce a written or printed order to
 stop the sale of a desert plant or a shipment of desert plants that
 is not accompanied by a manifest or other form of documentation as
 provided by Section 122.005. If an order is issued, a person may
 not sell the desert plant or shipment until proper documentation is
 provided.
 Sec. 122.007.  AUTHORITY TO SEIZE DESERT PLANTS.  (a)  In
 enforcing this chapter, the department with or without process may
 seize a desert plant or a shipment of desert plants that is:
 (1)  not accompanied by a manifest or other form of
 documentation as provided by Section 122.005; and
 (2)  intended for transfer out of this state.
 (b)  The department shall:
 (1)  return desert plants seized under this section to
 the owner of the land from which they were harvested; or
 (2)  if the department is not able to identify the owner
 of the land from which the desert plants were harvested, deliver
 them to the Parks and Wildlife Department.
 Sec. 122.008.  PENALTY. (a)  A person commits an offense if
 the person advertises, sells, or offers for sale to a first
 purchaser a desert plant or a shipment of desert plants that is not
 accompanied by a manifest or other form of documentation as
 provided by Section 122.005.
 (b)  An offense under this section is punishable by:
 (1)  a fine not to exceed $1,000;
 (2)  imprisonment for a term not to exceed 180 days; or
 (3)  both fine and imprisonment under this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Section 12.020, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  If a person violates a provision of law described by
 Subsection (c) or (c-1) or a rule or order adopted by the department
 under a provision of law described by Subsection (c) or (c-1), the
 department may assess an administrative penalty against the person
 as provided by this section.
 (b)  The penalty for each violation may be in an amount not to
 exceed the maximum provided by Subsection (c) or (c-1) [of this
 section]. Each day a violation continues or occurs may be
 considered a separate violation for purposes of penalty
 assessments.
 (c-1)  In addition to provisions described by Subsection
 (c), Chapter 122 is subject to this section and the applicable
 penalty amount is $500.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Not later than December 1, 2011, the
 Department of Agriculture shall adopt rules to administer Chapter
 122, Agriculture Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Chapter 122, Agriculture Code, as added by this Act,
 applies only to a sale, an offer for sale, or the transportation of
 a desert plant on or after January 1, 2012.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *