House | 05/22/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 5048 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 2384 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2384 | |
House | 03/28/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1097 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 755 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Nelson | Journal Page: 747 |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 747 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 747 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 376 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 376 | |
Senate | 02/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |