House
|
05/25/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 5416
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1225
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 376
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 376
|
Senate
|
02/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|