E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6278
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4138
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4138
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4138
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4138
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2981
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1185
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4366
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4345
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Isaac
|
Journal Page: 4345
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4345
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1225
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 641
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 377
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 377
|
Senate
|
02/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|