E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/21/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2977 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4761 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2777 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2976 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2617 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Record vote | RV#1160 | Journal Page: 4214 |
House | 05/19/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4214 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4214 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 4212 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4205 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4205 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1482 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1482 | |
House | 03/24/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1087 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 733 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 733 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 733 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 733 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 733 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 733 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 733 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |