House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6871
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4746
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5969
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5969
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3967
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3967
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3967
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3967
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3916
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3703
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5463
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1441
|
Journal Page: 5462
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5462
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Amended
|
3-Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 5460
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5459
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5366
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1394
|
Journal Page: 5365
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5365
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
9-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 5364
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
8-Aycock
|
Journal Page: 5363
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 5363
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
8-Aycock
|
Journal Page: 5362
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
4-Aycock
|
Journal Page: 5303
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 5303
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5300
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4617
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1292
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1260
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1260
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1260
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1085
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 412
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 412
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|