Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB637 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Nichols, Gallegos, Patrick S.B. No. 637
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2011; February 23, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 18, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; April 18, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 637 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the recovery of certain rate case expenses by an
 investor-owned water and sewer utility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (h), Section 13.185, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (h)  The regulatory authority may not include for ratemaking
 purposes:
 (1)  legislative advocacy expenses, whether made
 directly or indirectly, including legislative advocacy expenses
 included in trade association dues;
 (2)  costs of processing a refund or credit under
 Section 13.187 [of this chapter]; [or]
 (3)  legal expenses, including attorney's fees and
 court costs, incurred by an investor-owned water and sewer utility
 in a contested proceeding under Section 13.187 or an appeal of that
 proceeding unless the proceeding or appeal results in the approval
 of the utility's proposed rate, other than legal expenses described
 by Section 13.084; or
 (4)  any expenditure found by the regulatory authority
 to be unreasonable, unnecessary, or not in the public interest,
 including executive salaries, advertising expenses, legal expenses
 not described by Subdivision (3), and civil penalties or fines.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to a statement of intent
 for which a regulatory authority has not issued a final decision
 before the effective date of this Act. A statement of intent for
 which a regulatory authority has issued a final decision before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date that final decision was issued, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *