House
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1226
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 857
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 857
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 413
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 413
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|