Senate | 03/28/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 658 | |
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 552 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 552 | |
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |