House | 05/19/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4338 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 4139 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 3648 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3648 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3522 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2224 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2151 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2151 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2151 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2151 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2151 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2151 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2151 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1645 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1425 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 413 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 413 | |
Senate | 02/21/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |