E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/26/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4034
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5957
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3272
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3272
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3272
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3269
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4304
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1174
|
Journal Page: 4304
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4304
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Workman, D. Howard, Strama, Rodriguez, Isaac, Naishtat, Schwertner, and Dukes
|
Journal Page: 4303
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 4302
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4302
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/19/11 3:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4228
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4228
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4145
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4145
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Workman
|
Journal Page: 4144
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4143
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4141
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1792
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 450
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 450
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|