E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5149
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5054
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6497
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1681
|
Journal Page: 6496
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6496
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2647
|
Journal Page: 6493
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6458
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4574
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4574
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1240
|
Journal Page: 4574
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4485
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5742
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5742
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3263
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3263
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3263
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3262
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3252
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2569
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1147
|
Journal Page: 4134
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4134
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4134
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Amended
|
4-Weber
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4087
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Weber
|
Journal Page: 4087
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4086
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/17/11 1:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/17/11 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3977
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3977
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/13/11 7:30 AM
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2249
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3652
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1134
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1059
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1059
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1059
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 1059
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Ellis
|
Journal Page: 1059
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1058
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1058
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1058
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 494
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 494
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|