E
|
05/19/2011
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/19/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2613
|
E
|
05/09/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2084
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3089
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1785
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1506
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#601
|
Journal Page: 2397
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2397
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Amended
|
4-Veasey
|
Journal Page: 2397
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-Veasey
|
Journal Page: 2397
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2396
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Madden
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
16-Madden
|
Journal Page: 2372
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
1-Madden
|
Journal Page: 2372
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amended
|
15-Veasey
|
Journal Page: 2372
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
13-Allen
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
12-McClendon
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2366
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1915
|
Journal Page: 2366
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1134
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1068
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1068
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1068
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1068
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 495
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 495
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|