Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB654 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Whitmire, Hegar S.B. No. 654
22 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2011; March 8, 2011, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on Government Organization;
44 March 31, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
55 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 31, 2011,
66 sent to printer.)
77 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 654 By: Hegar
88
99
1010 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1111 AN ACT
1212 relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Public
1313 Finance Authority.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. Section 1232.072, Government Code, is amended to
1616 read as follows:
1717 Sec. 1232.072. SUNSET PROVISION. The Texas Public Finance
1818 Authority is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless
1919 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the authority
2020 is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2023 [2011].
2121 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 1232, Government Code, is
2222 amended by adding Section 1232.073 to read as follows:
2323 Sec. 1232.073. NEGOTIATED RULEMAKING AND ALTERNATIVE
2424 DISPUTE RESOLUTION. (a) The board shall develop and implement a
2525 policy to encourage the use of:
2626 (1) negotiated rulemaking procedures under Chapter
2727 2008 for the adoption of authority rules; and
2828 (2) appropriate alternative dispute resolution
2929 procedures under Chapter 2009 to assist in the resolution of
3030 internal and external disputes under the authority's jurisdiction.
3131 (b) The authority's procedures relating to alternative
3232 dispute resolution must conform, to the extent possible, to any
3333 model guidelines issued by the State Office of Administrative
3434 Hearings for the use of alternative dispute resolution by state
3535 agencies.
3636 (c) The authority shall:
3737 (1) coordinate the implementation of the policy
3838 adopted under Subsection (a);
3939 (2) provide training as needed to implement the
4040 procedures for negotiated rulemaking or alternative dispute
4141 resolution; and
4242 (3) collect data concerning the effectiveness of those
4343 procedures.
4444 SECTION 3. Section 1232.101, Government Code, is amended to
4545 read as follows:
4646 Sec. 1232.101. ISSUANCE OF BONDS FOR CERTAIN STATE
4747 AGENCIES. (a) With respect to all bonds authorized to be issued by
4848 or on behalf of the adjutant general's department, Parks and
4949 Wildlife Department, Texas Agricultural Finance Authority, Texas
5050 Low-Level Radioactive Waste Disposal Authority[, Stephen F. Austin
5151 State University], Midwestern State University, and Texas Southern
5252 University, the authority has the exclusive authority to act on
5353 behalf of those entities in issuing bonds on their behalf. In
5454 connection with those issuances and with the issuance of refunding
5555 bonds on behalf of those entities, the authority is subject to all
5656 rights, duties, and conditions surrounding issuance previously
5757 applicable to the issuing entity under the statute authorizing the
5858 issuance. A reference in an authorizing statute to the entity on
5959 whose behalf the bonds are being issued applies equally to the
6060 authority in its capacity as issuer on behalf of the entity.
6161 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (a), the authority may,
6262 under an agreement entered into with Texas State Technical College
6363 System or a general academic teaching institution as defined by
6464 Section 61.003, Education Code, act on behalf of Texas State
6565 Technical College System or a general academic teaching institution
6666 in issuing bonds on the system's or institution's behalf. In
6767 connection with those issuances and with the issuance of refunding
6868 bonds on behalf of the system or those institutions, the authority
6969 is subject to all rights, duties, and conditions surrounding
7070 issuance previously applicable to the issuing system or institution
7171 under the statute authorizing the issuance. A reference in an
7272 authorizing statute to the system or institution on whose behalf
7373 the bonds are being issued applies equally to the authority in its
7474 capacity as issuer on behalf of the system or institution. An
7575 agreement under this subsection may provide for reimbursement to
7676 the authority for costs incurred in issuing bonds under the
7777 agreement.
7878 SECTION 4. Subchapter C, Chapter 1232, Government Code, is
7979 amended by adding Section 1232.1221 to read as follows:
8080 Sec. 1232.1221. COMMENCEMENT OF CERTAIN MULTIYEAR
8181 CANCER-RELATED PROJECTS. A multiyear project for which funds are
8282 granted by the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas
8383 Oversight Committee as authorized by Section 102.257, Health and
8484 Safety Code, may begin after:
8585 (1) the authority has certified that obligations in an
8686 amount sufficient to pay the money needed to fund the project have
8787 been authorized for issuance by the authority and approved by the
8888 Bond Review Board; or
8989 (2) the proceeds have been deposited into the state
9090 treasury and:
9191 (A) the comptroller has certified that the
9292 proceeds are available;
9393 (B) the reserve funds and capitalized interest,
9494 as certified by the authority as reasonably required, have been
9595 paid; and
9696 (C) the costs of issuing the obligations, as
9797 certified by the authority, have been paid.
9898 SECTION 5. Subsection (c), Section 55.13, Education Code,
9999 is amended to read as follows:
100100 (c) Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
101101 with respect to all bonds authorized to be issued by Midwestern
102102 State University[, Stephen F. Austin State University,] or Texas
103103 Southern University, the Texas Public Finance Authority shall
104104 exercise the authority of a board to issue bonds on behalf of those
105105 institutions, in the manner provided by this subchapter, including
106106 the authority to issue refunding bonds under Section 55.19. In
107107 connection with the issuance of bonds under this chapter, the Texas
108108 Public Finance Authority has all the rights and duties granted or
109109 assigned to and is subject to the same conditions as a board under
110110 this chapter.
111111 SECTION 6. Section 102.257, Health and Safety Code, is
112112 amended to read as follows:
113113 Sec. 102.257. MULTIYEAR PROJECTS. The oversight committee
114114 may grant funds for a multiyear project. The oversight committee
115115 must specify the total amount of [All the] money approved [needed]
116116 to fund the [a] multiyear project. The total amount specified is
117117 considered for purposes of this subchapter to have been [must be]
118118 awarded in the state fiscal year that the project is approved by the
119119 research and prevention programs committee. The institute shall
120120 distribute only the money that will be expended during that fiscal
121121 year. The remaining money shall be [maintained in an escrow account
122122 to be] distributed by the institute as the money is needed in each
123123 subsequent fiscal year [years of the project].
124124 SECTION 7. (a) The changes in law made by this Act apply
125125 only to a grant of funds for a multiyear project by the Cancer
126126 Prevention and Research Institute of Texas Oversight Committee as
127127 authorized by Section 102.257, Health and Safety Code, as amended
128128 by this Act, made on or after September 1, 2011. A grant of funds
129129 for a multiyear project made before that date is governed by the law
130130 in effect on the date the grant was made, and the former law is
131131 continued in effect for that purpose.
132132 (b) The changes in law made by this Act to Section 55.13,
133133 Education Code, and Section 1232.101, Government Code, apply only
134134 to bonds authorized on or after the effective date of this Act.
135135 Bonds authorized before that date are governed by the law in effect
136136 on the date the bonds were authorized, and the former law is
137137 continued in effect for that purpose.
138138 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
139139 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
140140 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
141141 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
142142 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
143143 * * * * *