Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5742
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5742
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3252
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3252
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3252
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3252
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3218
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#632
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Amended
|
3-Strama
|
Journal Page: 2692
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2692
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2637
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amended
|
41-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 2636
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#626
|
Journal Page: 2634
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
38-Veasey
|
Journal Page: 2634
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
39-Veasey
|
Journal Page: 2633
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
38-Veasey
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
33-Workman
|
Journal Page: 2624
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
29-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2606
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
19-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 2605
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2578
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 18
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
14-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 2357
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
14-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 2356
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2349
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#595
|
Journal Page: 2349
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
12-Farrar
|
Journal Page: 2348
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2348
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amended
|
11-P. King
|
Journal Page: 2347
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
8-Turner
|
Journal Page: 2344
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
9-Turner
|
Journal Page: 2344
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
6-Farrar
|
Journal Page: 2342
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
3-Cook
|
Journal Page: 2334
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1641
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1641
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1502
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 897
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 897
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 897
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 896
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 896
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 896
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 896
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 895
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 895
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 888
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 807
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 699
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 658
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 495
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 495
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|