E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/31/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5148
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5149
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5083
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6603
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1706
|
Journal Page: 6602
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6602
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2659
|
Journal Page: 6600
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6872
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5073
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1250
|
Journal Page: 5073
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4610
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4532
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4532
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6270
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6270
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6283
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6283
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6283
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4372
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4372
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 4372
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 4372
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 4373
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4372
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4348
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2689
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4378
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1193
|
Journal Page: 4377
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4377
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Keffer
|
Journal Page: 4375
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4375
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/20/11 4:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4372
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4371
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4310
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4310
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
5-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 4310
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
6-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 4309
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
5-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 4309
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amended
|
4-Price
|
Journal Page: 4308
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4305
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4125
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2782
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1292
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1252
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1252
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 1252
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1252
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1252
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1250
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1250
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 552
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 552
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|