House
|
05/24/2011
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(3)
|
Journal Page: 5204
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5203
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/24/11 5:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 5174
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(3)
|
Journal Page: 5174
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5173
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2907
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2088
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1195
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1195
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1195
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1194
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1194
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1194
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 1194
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA7 Davis
|
Journal Page: 1192
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1189
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1188
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1188
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 552
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 552
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|