E | 06/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/21/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2977 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4613 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2691 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2711 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Record vote | RV#1162 | Journal Page: 4228 |
House | 05/19/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4228 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4228 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4141 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4141 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3527 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 2002 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2002 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1865 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1163 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1107 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1107 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1107 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1106 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1106 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1106 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1106 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1132 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 552 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 552 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |