E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6280
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2689
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4371
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1187
|
Journal Page: 4370
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4370
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4370
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4302
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 4302
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4301
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1048
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1016
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1016
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1016
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1015
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1015
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1015
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1015
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Nichols
|
Journal Page: 1015
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1015
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1015
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 553
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 553
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|