House | 03/29/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1108 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1108 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 901 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 593 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 593 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 593 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 593 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 593 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 593 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 593 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 486 | |
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 209 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 209 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |