Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Motion to suspend regular order fails
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Open Government, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|