House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4765 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 2793 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2793 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2794 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1667 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1667 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1667 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1667 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1666 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1666 | |
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1666 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1381 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1163 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 415 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 415 | |
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |