E | 06/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/21/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2977 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4613 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2691 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2711 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2569 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4132 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Record vote | RV#1144 | Journal Page: 4131 |
House | 05/18/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4131 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4131 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4083 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4083 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3526 | |
House | 05/07/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1833 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1833 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1048 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1021 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Duncan | Journal Page: 1020 |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1020 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 415 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 415 | |
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |