E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 1/1/12
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/25/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2993
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2993
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2993
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2993
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1103
|
Journal Page: 3964
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3964
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3964
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3960
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1259
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2091
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1482
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1098
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 759
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 759
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 759
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 758
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 758
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 758
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 758
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 515
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 415
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 415
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|