E | 06/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/21/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2977 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4761 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2777 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2976 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2689 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4416 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Record vote | RV#1203 | Journal Page: 4415 |
House | 05/20/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4415 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 4415 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | Journal Page: 4379 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 4372 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4372 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4310 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4310 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4310 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3526 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 2652 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2652 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2655 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1645 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1487 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1487 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1487 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1487 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |