Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB714 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Patrick S.B. No. 714
 (In the Senate - Filed February 15, 2011; February 23, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 4, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 3, Nays 1;
 April 4, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 714 By:  Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption of certain property from municipal
 drainage service charges and from related ordinances, resolutions,
 and rules.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (e), Section 552.053, Local
 Government Code, as added by Chapters 278 (S.B. 874) and 539 (S.B.
 1522), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is
 reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 (e)  The following property is exempt from drainage charges
 under Section 552.047 and all ordinances, resolutions, and rules
 adopted under this subchapter:
 (1)  property owned by a county in which a municipality
 described by Section 552.044(8)(A) is located;
 (2)  property owned by a school district located wholly
 or partly in a municipality described by Section 552.044(8)(A); and
 (3)  property located in a municipality with a
 population of 1.9 million or more that is owned by:
 (A)  a church, synagogue, or other organization or
 association organized primarily for religious purposes;
 (B)  a nonprofit organization that is exempt from
 federal income taxation under Section 501(a), Internal Revenue Code
 of 1986, by being certified as an exempt organization under Section
 501(c)(3) of that code; or
 (C)  an entity authorized to impose a tax.
 SECTION 2.  Section 552.053, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  A municipality with a population of 1.9 million or more
 may not increase a drainage charge on nonexempt property to
 compensate for amounts not collected as a result of providing
 exemptions required by this section.
 SECTION 3.  Section 580.003, Local Government Code, as
 redesignated by Chapter 885 (H.B. 2278), Acts of the 80th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, and amended by Chapters 1356
 (H.B. 462) and 1430 (S.B. 3), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2007, is reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 580.003.  EXEMPTIONS OF CERTAIN PROPERTY FROM
 INFRASTRUCTURE FEES. (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), no
 county, municipality, or utility district may collect from a state
 agency or a public or private institution of higher education any
 fee charged for the development or maintenance of programs or
 facilities for the control of excess water or storm water.
 (b)  A municipality with a population of 25,000 or less and
 through which the Bosque River runs may collect from a state agency
 or public institution of higher education a fee charged for the
 development or maintenance of programs or [of] facilities for the
 control of excess water or storm water.
 (c)  A municipality with a population of 1.9 million or more
 may not collect any fee charged for the development or maintenance
 of programs or facilities for the control of excess water or storm
 water from:
 (1)  a church, synagogue, or other organization or
 association organized primarily for religious purposes;
 (2)  a nonprofit organization that is exempt from
 federal income taxation under Section 501(a), Internal Revenue Code
 of 1986, by being certified as an exempt organization under Section
 501(c)(3) of that code; or
 (3)  an entity authorized to impose a tax.
 (d)  A municipality with a population of 1.9 million or more
 may not increase a fee on nonexempt property to compensate for
 amounts not collected as a result of providing exemptions required
 by this section.
 SECTION 4.  To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
 over another Act of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *