House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1046 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1573 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1026 | |
04/07/2011 | Passed | |||
04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | |||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 970 | |
04/07/2011 | Three day rule suspended | |||
04/07/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | |||
04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |||
04/07/2011 | Laid before the Senate | |||
04/07/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1001 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 832 | |
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 724 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |