Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB723 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Williams S.B. No. 723
 (In the Senate - Filed February 15, 2011; February 23, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 14, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 2, 1 present not voting; April 14, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the proof of an applicant's identity and age required
 for the issuance of a marriage license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (b), Section 2.005, Family Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The proof must be established by:
 (1)  a driver's license or identification card issued
 by this state, another state, or a Canadian province that is current
 or has expired not more than two years preceding the date the
 identification is submitted to the county clerk in connection with
 an application for a license;
 (2)  a United States passport;
 (3)  a current passport issued by a foreign country or a
 consular document issued by a state or national government;
 (4)  an unexpired Certificate of United States
 Citizenship, Certificate of Naturalization, United States Citizen
 Identification Card, Permanent Resident Card, Temporary Resident
 Card, Employment Authorization Card, or other document issued by
 the federal Department of Homeland Security or the United States
 Department of State including an identification photograph;
 (5)  an unexpired military identification card for
 active duty, reserve, or retired personnel with an identification
 photograph;
 (6)  an original or certified copy of a birth
 certificate issued by a bureau of vital statistics for a state or a
 foreign government;
 (7)  an original or certified copy of a Consular Report
 of Birth Abroad or Certificate of Birth Abroad issued by the United
 States Department of State;
 (8)  an original or certified copy of a court order
 relating to the applicant's name change [or sex change];
 (9)  school records from a secondary school or
 institution of higher education;
 (10)  an insurance policy continuously valid for the
 two years preceding the date of the application for a license;
 (11)  a motor vehicle certificate of title;
 (12)  military records, including documentation of
 release or discharge from active duty or a draft record;
 (13)  an unexpired military dependent identification
 card;
 (14)  an original or certified copy of the applicant's
 marriage license or divorce decree;
 (15)  a voter registration certificate;
 (16)  a pilot's license issued by the Federal Aviation
 Administration or another authorized agency of the United States;
 (17)  a license to carry a concealed handgun under
 Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Government Code;
 (18)  a temporary driving permit or a temporary
 identification card issued by the Department of Public Safety; or
 (19)  an offender identification card issued by the
 Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an application for a marriage license submitted to a county clerk
 on or after the effective date of this Act. An application for a
 marriage license submitted before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect immediately before that date, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *