E | 05/10/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/10/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2225 | |
E | 04/28/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1428 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2385 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1371 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Record vote | RV#511 | Journal Page: 2196 |
House | 04/26/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2196 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2196 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2177 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2189 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2189 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB1436 | Journal Page: 2189 |
House | 04/26/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2323 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1573 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1026 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 02/16/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |