House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4766
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 2793
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2793
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2794
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1678
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1678
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1678
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 419
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 419
|
Senate
|
02/16/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|