E | 04/29/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 04/29/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1604 | |
E | 04/20/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1281 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2002 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1234 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1143 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Record vote | RV#377 | Journal Page: 1803 |
House | 04/14/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1756 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1756 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1824 | Journal Page: 1756 |
House | 04/13/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1483 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1483 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1223 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 868 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 02/16/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |