E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3613
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1422
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/25/11 3:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 5425
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5425
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5088
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5088
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 5088
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 5088
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5088
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/23/11 10:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 4917
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 8, Section 10
|
Journal Page: 4916
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4916
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1311
|
Journal Page: 4915
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 4915
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
3-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2 and Rule 11, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 4910
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 4910
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4910
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4910
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
Journal Page: 4768
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4745
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 4741
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4741
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3637
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2389
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1391
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1391
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1391
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1343
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 419
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 419
|
Senate
|
02/16/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|