E | 06/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/25/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3794 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5382 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3430 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3527 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3105 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4802 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Record vote | RV#1264 | Journal Page: 4804 |
House | 05/23/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4804 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4804 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 4770 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4782 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4782 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1083 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1573 | |
04/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | |||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 970 | |
04/07/2011 | Three day rule suspended | |||
04/07/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | |||
04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 970 | |
04/07/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 420 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 420 | |
Senate | 02/16/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |