House | 04/14/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1086 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1043 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1043 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1043 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1043 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1043 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1043 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1043 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 964 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 420 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 420 | |
Senate | 02/16/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |