E | 05/27/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 05/27/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4526 | |
E | 05/16/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2376 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4060 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2327 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2270 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2200 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3347 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Record vote | RV#917 | Journal Page: 3347 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3347 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3347 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3249 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3249 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 270 | Journal Page: 3249 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3092 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1086 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |