E | 06/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4526 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6276 | |
05/26/2011 | Signed in the House | |||
Senate | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4010 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4034 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 5762 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3678 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 3678 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Read | Journal Page: 3678 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3674 | |
Senate | 05/24/2011 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 3334 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Record vote | RV#1292 | Journal Page: 4841 |
House | 05/23/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4841 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4841 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 4740 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Amended | 2-Solomons | Journal Page: 4739 |
House | 05/21/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4739 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4338 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1483 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1483 | |
House | 03/28/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1098 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 742 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 742 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 742 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 742 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 742 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 742 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 741 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 514 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 422 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 422 | |
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |